Accounts and annual returns AL-MADINA JAMIA MASJID ISLAMIC EDUCATIONAL & CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1143153
Charity reporting is up to date (67 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 08 April 2025 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 08 April 2025 67 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 April 2025 433 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 08 April 2025 433 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 April 2025 798 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 April 2025 798 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 February 2022 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 February 2022 23 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 June 2021 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 June 2021 136 days late Download Open in new window