THIRD SECTOR NATIONAL LEARNING ALLIANCE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Acting as a national voice for the third sector in learning and skills Champion the unique role of third sector providers in reaching those people at most disadvantage Enable the exchange of information and best practice so that providers continue to improve the quality of learning delivered Work with all other sectors and agencies to ensure the effective delivery of good quality learning
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 March 2012: Standard registration
- 03 March 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- TSNLA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.54k | £39.73k | £64.13k | £51.70k | £17.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.57k | £46.30k | £75.12k | £52.11k | £21.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.87k | £7.38k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 17 September 2019 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 17 September 2019 | 79 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/08/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/03/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK OF THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING LEARNING AND SKILLS SERVICES BY. 3.1 ACTING AS A NATIONAL VOICE FOR THIRD SECTOR PROVIDERS OF LEARNING AND SKILLS SERVICES; 3.2 ENABLING THE EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION AND BEST PRACTICE AMONGST THIRD SECTOR LEARNING AND SKILLS PROVIDERS; 3.3 PROMOTING AND ADVANCING THIRD SECTOR LEARNING AND SKILLS PROVISION; AND 3.4 PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO LEARNING AND SKILLS PROVIDED BY THE THIRD SECTOR AND PUBLICATION AND DISSEMINATION OF USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH. ('THIRD SECTOR' MEANS VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS, CHARITIES AND OTHER FORMS OF SOCIAL ENTERPRISE FOR PUBLIC AND COMMUNITY BENEFIT WHOSE CONSTITUTIONS PROHIBIT THE DISTRIBUTION OF SURPLUS FUNDS)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window