Financial history WINNING FAITH CHAPEL

Charity number: 1142943
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £37.36k £2.52k £36.58k £43.19k £55.55k
Total expenditure £18.99k £7.30k £34.58k £15.36k £18.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £14.94k