GUILDFORD POYLE CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Guildford Poyle Charities gives grants of goods or services to individuals in need who are resident in the central part of Guildford and also gives grants to organisations working with those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 09 November 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew William Hamilton | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Warchus | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Creese | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Audrey Elizabeth Howells | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN MILLS | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Christopher Roberts | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Kiley | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Susan Bass | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Elisabeth Robinson | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Moyra Clare Matravers | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Evans | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR Jonathan Norris | Trustee | 26 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Drury Debbie | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Freeman | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tim Metson | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Gray | Trustee | 23 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £222.58k | £149.09k | £127.79k | £148.28k | £148.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.50k | £164.74k | £201.23k | £213.06k | £223.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/12/2011
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN GUILDFORD POYLE CHARITIES AREA OF BENEFIT BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OF FACILITIES. B) TO ENABLE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO INDIVIDUALS OR ORGANISATIONS SO AS TO PREVENT PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Linked charities
- 09 November 1999 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
GUILDFORD POYLE CHARITIES
208 HIGH STREET
GUILDFORD
GU1 3JB
- Phone:
- 01483 303678
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window