Financial history COMMUNITY ENVIRONMENTAL TRUST

Charity Number: 1144788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £102.53k £91.87k £107.22k £136.87k £167.52k
Total expenditure £91.73k £85.40k £112.13k £120.53k £131.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £5.00k £15.97k