Accounts and annual returns THE STEPHENSON JAMES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1143369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 11 March 2024 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 11 March 2024 35 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 14 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required