Financial history THE STEPHENSON JAMES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1143369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £20.20k £14.73k £17.04k £88.38k £17.50k
Total expenditure £31.87k £55.35k £19.21k £72.83k £21.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A