Financial history PETIT MIRACLE INTERIORS LTD

Charity number: 1143542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £203.37k £172.27k £212.43k £168.55k £214.85k
Total expenditure £254.63k £141.75k £175.85k £211.03k £189.86k
Income from government contracts £25.00k £48.95k £48.95k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £67.05k £28.47k N/A £1.50k