DIAMOND WAY TEACHINGS AND CENTRES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE BY PROMOTING A GREATER AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF TIBETAN LAY BUDDHISM AND THE CULTURE OF TIBET.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 July 2011: Standard registration
- DWTC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Borislav Popov | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Steinhauer | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rafal Bihun | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Liliana Dimitrova Shalamanova-Malinowski | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tobias Rossberg | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £270.62k | £355.37k | £230.81k | £320.87k | £337.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £302.43k | £285.64k | £313.09k | £213.66k | £278.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 04 July 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 04 July 2024 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 20 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 11 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 11 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/07/2011 as amended on 07 May 2017
Charitable objects
4.1. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE ÔÇ£OBJECTSÔÇØ) ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: 4.1.1 EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE BY PROMOTING A GREATER AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF TIBETAN LAY BUDDHISM AND THE CULTURE OF TIBET BY: 4.1.1(A) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES, LIBRARIES AND CULTURAL CENTRES; AND 4.1.1(B) THE TEACHING AND PRACTICE OF LAY BUDDHIST PHILOSOPHY WITHIN THE TRADITION OF THE KARMA KAGYU LINEAGE OF DIAMOND WAY BUDDHISM UNDER THE SPIRITUAL AUTHORITY OF HIS HOLINESS THE 17TH KARMAPA TRINLEY THAYE DORJE AND LAMA OLE NYDAHL AND THEIR SUCCESSORS; AND 4.1.2 TO MAINTAIN, SUPPORT, OR CONTRIBUTE TOWARDS SUCH ONE OR MORE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE COMPANIES, INSTITUTIONS, ASSOCIATIONS, TRUST AND SOCIETIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD THAT SEEK TO ADVANCE THE LAY TRADITION OF THE KARMA KAGYU LINEAGE OF DIAMOND WAY BUDDHISM UNDER THE SPIRITUAL AUTHORITY OF HIS HOLINESS THE 17TH KARMAPA THAYE DORJE AND LAMA OLE NYDAHL AND THEIR SUCCESSORS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BEAUFOY
39 BLACK PRINCE ROAD
LONDON
SE11 6JJ
- Phone:
- 02075871718
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window