SPECTRUM SOUTH WEST WALES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SPECTRUM SOUTH WEST WALES (SSWW) IS AN LGBT CHARITY PROMOTING EQUALITY & DIVERSITY IN FAVOUR OF LGBT PEOPLE. SSWW HOSTS THE REGION'S ANNUAL GAY PRIDE EVENT, SWANSEA PRIDE, AS WELL AS CO-ORDINATING OTHER ACTIVITIES SUCH AS CURATING SWANSEA BAY LGBT HISTORY MONTH. SSWW ALSO PARTNERS WITH ORGANISATIONS WHERE AN LGBT PERSPECTIVE IS REQUIRED FOR SERVICE DELIVERY DESIGN, DEVELOPMENT AND MARKETING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bridgend
- Carmarthenshire
- City Of Swansea
- Neath Port Talbot
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 20 September 2011: Standard registration
- 01 November 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- PINK IN THE PARK (Working name)
- SWANSEA PRIDE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.14k | £31.97k | £19.14k | £1.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.05k | £28.27k | £22.37k | £1.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 30/08/2011 AS AMENDED ON 26/02/2013
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND GENDER IDENTITY OF THOSE LIVING IN SWANSEA AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY: I) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE ISSUES AND DIFFICULTIES AFFECTING THE LIVES OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER (LGBT) PEOPLE; II) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN PARTICULAR THROUGH CELEBRATING THE DIVERSITY OF THE LGBT COMMUNITY; AND III) STAGING AN ANNUAL LGBT FESTIVAL AND SMALLER EVENTS THROUGHOUT THE AREA 3.2 SUCH OTHER OBJECTS AS ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window