THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, UPPER NORWOOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The central purpose of St John's Church is to offer the Mass, pray for the community and the good of all creation. We provide a palace of worship for the community, offer pastoral care, teaching and guidance in the Christian Faith. We offer the sacraments of Baptism, Holy Matrimony and attend to the needs of the departed. This is done within a south-east London Parish which is diverse and lively.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Croydon
Governance
- 29 September 2011: Standard registration
- ST JOHN'S PCC, UPPER NORWOOD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JOHN ANTHONY PRITCHARD | Chair | 11 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Alice Wood | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Christopher Gaitskell | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzette Diaz | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Noel | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Damon Marcus Stewart Brash | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Barber | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Goodstien-Oliver | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Margaret Mary Desbruslais | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Wimpress | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ikediashi | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Wheble | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aminatta Lisk | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Elizabeth Gledhill | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jermaine Weekes | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas David Bucknall | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET MARY STEPHENS | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE GORDON ROBERTS | Trustee | 27 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FRANCIS STEPHENS | Trustee | 27 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £256.70k | £336.02k | £349.55k | £327.50k | £270.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £203.60k | £236.27k | £261.58k | £368.62k | £309.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 November 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 November 2021 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1956
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 SYLVAN ROAD
LONDON
SE19 2RX
- Phone:
- 02087716686
- Email:
- sjunoffice@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window