IQRA-WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enable and empower women by providing information,education and training to minority ethnic women in Aylesbury and assist them to succeed in their personal lives, work and community. IQRA aims to support,educate and train women to become independent,integrate within the society they are living in. IQRA offers an outreach free drop In information, advocacy and support sessions in Aylesbury.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 19 September 2011: Standard registration
- IQRA (Working name)
- IQRA - BUCKS ASIAN WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Iram Sial | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rubina Javaid | Trustee | 30 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
FARZANA AKRAM | Trustee | 27 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.82k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 May 2023 | 186 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 19/09/2011 AS AMENDED ON 27 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY ASIAN WOMEN LIVING IN AYLESBURY VALE DISTRICT OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND TRAINING SESSIONS ON SUBJECTS RELEVANT TO ASIAN WOMEN'S NEEDS AND PAKISTANI CULTURE INCLUDING ART, FOOD AND MUSIC. (2)TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO ASIAN WOMEN LIVING IN AYLESBURY VALE DISTRICT OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE. (3) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS IN AYLESBURY VALE DISTRICT OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
135 Aston Clinton Road
Weston Turville
AYLESBURY
HP22 5AD
- Phone:
- 07415378402
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window