THE AIMING HIGH GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Aiming high Group aims to act on the priorities of the parents, carers, children and young people with disabilities and special needs.The Group provides a self help network for families and communities that have children with disabiliities/special needs..The Aiming high group aims to involve all the family and community around a child with disability and special needs. .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 12 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 12 March 2012: Standard registration
- THE AHG (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NAZREEN RASHID | Chair | 12 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
SALEHA ZIA | Trustee | 12 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
SOBIA SADAF | Trustee | 12 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 12/03/2020 | 12/03/2021 | 12/03/2022 | 12/03/2023 | 12/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 March 2023 | 06 February 2025 | 391 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 March 2021 | 05 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/01/2011 AS AMENDED ON 20/02/2012
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE AND FACILITIES DIRECTED TO THOSE NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Family Voice
105 Paynels
Orton Goldhay
PETERBOROUGH
PE2 5QP
- Phone:
- 01733 685510
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window