PERSONAL BEST SOCCER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Coaching takes place x2 a week, with UEFA qualified coaches, plus games against academy teams. The coaching provides innovative methods to build confidence and social interaction, as well as football skills. Educate the players in all aspects of a sporting lifestyle and encourage continued development through links with Easton College and Dereham Football club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 18 October 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Suffling | Chair | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lee Perry | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tom Parke | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.53k | £39.81k | £53.69k | £75.99k | £76.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.64k | £27.45k | £52.05k | £72.62k | £70.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/08/2008 AS AMENDED ON 14/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 28/09/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN NORWICH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING THE OPPORTUNITY AND FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 BAWBURGH MILL
HARTS LANE
BAWBURGH
NORWICH
NR9 3LS
- Phone:
- 07985267313
- Email:
- jamessuffling6@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window