THE ENERGY SAVING TRUST FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundations object's are to promote and to advance the education of the public in the conservation, protection, and improvement of the physical and natural environment so as to further the protection of the world's climate systems, including by reducing and making sustainable the use of energy and water and ensuring the prudent use of non-renewable resources for public benefit?.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 October 2011: Standard registration
- ESTF (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zoe Hannah Bonnett | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Jasmine Newhouse | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ella Thorne | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julian Olivier | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carys Louise Nelkon | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daisy Crowfoot | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Elliot Metcalfe | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Collinson | Trustee | 31 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Cobbold | Trustee | 07 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £500.00k | £521.00k | £238.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.00k | £16.00k | £123.00k | £136.00k | £825.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £521.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £130.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 February 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 February 2024 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/10/2014 as amended on 02 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION, AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT SO AS TO FURTHER THE PROTECTION OF THE WORLD'S CLIMATE SYSTEMS, INCLUDING BY REDUCING AND MAKING SUSTAINABLE THE USE OF ENERGY AND WATER AND ENSURING THE PRUDENT USE OF NON-RENEWABLE RESOURCES FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Energy Saving Trust Foundation
223-231 Pentonville Road
London
N1 9NG
- Phone:
- 02072220101
- Email:
- foundation@est.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window