THROCKLEY PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1143582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We bring together school staff, parents and the local community. Our activities are planned to enhance the school experience of our pupils and include disco's, fairs and special events. We also raise funds for special equipment for school such as play equipment, library books and uniforms for our sports teams.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £2,063
Total expenditure: £2,698

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Newcastle Upon Tyne City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 August 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LEE COMSTOCK Chair 30 August 2011
None on record
Amy Griffin Trustee 21 January 2021
None on record
Lynsey Giblin Trustee 30 January 2017
None on record
Julie Stuart Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £2.84k £4.64k £5.99k £2.06k
Total expenditure £215 £3.25k £3.42k £3.67k £2.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 May 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Throckley Primary School
Hexham Road
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE15 9DY
Phone:
01912675311