BIRMINGHAM PHAB CAMPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Voluntary Organisation that provides holidays aimed at creating inclusive and diverse friendships for all children, with and without disabilities, living throughout the Birmingham area. We are staffed entirely by volunteers. We arrange a series of holidays for groups of twenty (50% disabled) young people aged 8 to 16, in various age groups, during Easter and the summer holidays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 16 March 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Thomas Miles | Chair | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Diane Dunigan | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Spittle | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER HARDY | Trustee | 09 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Grant McCaig | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY RATE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.99k | £78.69k | £114.86k | £123.40k | £143.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.04k | £110.30k | £143.14k | £121.39k | £137.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 7 JANUARY 1973
Charitable objects
TO INTEGRATE THE SOCIAL AND LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES OF BOTH PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED AND ABLE-BODIED YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF GOVERNING INSTRUMENT.)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Daventry Grove
BIRMINGHAM
B32 1JA
- Phone:
- 07500951134
- Email:
- andrewm@bhamphabcamps.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window