THE PYGMY HIPPO FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the conservation, preservation and protection for the benefit of the public of the Pygmy Hippo and other species in their natural environments. To advance the education of the public by promoting understanding and knowledge of the Pygmy Hippo and of other endangered species in their natural environment and their conservation, preservation and protection.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Guinea
- Liberia
- Mali
Governance
- 31 August 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr Monro | Trustee | 20 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS ROWLAND HILL | Trustee | 31 August 2011 |
|
|||||
DANIEL EDWARD BETTS | Trustee | 31 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £922 | £477 | £1.58k | £53 | £262 | |
|
Total expenditure | £682 | £1.99k | £723 | £66 | £1.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 August 2024 | 301 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 August 2024 | 666 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 June 2021 | 221 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/04/2015
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF THE PYGMY HIPPO IN ITS NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING UNDERSTANDING AND KNOWLEDGE OF THE PYGMY HIPPO IN ITS NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND ITS CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION; (3) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF OTHER SPECIES AND THEIR NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; AND (4) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING UNDERSTANDING AND KNOWLEDGE OF ENDANGERED SPECIES IN THEIR NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND THEIR CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 MOUNT ROW
LONDON
W1K 3SG
- Phone:
- 02074096660
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window