WELSH ASSOCIATION OF ME & CFS SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WAMES activities in Wales: campaign for recognition of ME as a neurological illness campaign for appropriate health, education, social care services, benefits and research raise awareness of ME offer support to young people with ME provide information in Welsh and English for people with ME, their families & professionals aid local support groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 04 November 2011: Standard registration
- WAMES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Ann Chandler | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JAN RUSSELL | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA CHRISTINE PENNY | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE ELINOR PENNY | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
TONY THOMPSON | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £969 | £510 | £832 | £605 | £1.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.56k | £743 | £622 | £1.36k | £727 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 March 2022 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JAN 2007 AS AMENDED ON 25 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ME (ALSO CALLED MYALGIC ENCEPHALOMYELITIS OR MYALGIC ENCEPHALOPATHY OR POST VIRAL SYNDROME OR CHRONIC FATIGUE SYNDROME) AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO ARE RESIDENT IN WALES BY CAMPAIGNING, AWARENESS RAISING AND SUPPLYING INFORMATION AND SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Coach House
Frongog
Aberystwyth
SY23 3HN
- Phone:
- 01970636515
- Email:
- helpline@wames.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.