NORTHAMPTONSHIRE PARENT INFANT PARTNERSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NorPIP is a Charity setup in 2011 to provide specialist therapeutic counselling services in Northamptonshire and Cambridgeshire for mums, dads, and babies. The service promotes early intervention in families whose lives are affected by perinatal & infant mental health and delayed attachment, working to develop safe and secure emotional wellbeing for parents and their babies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 10 October 2011: Standard registration
- 09 January 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NORPIP (Working name)
- THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE PARENT INFANT PROJECT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £388.78k | £452.60k | £278.60k | £268.58k | £56.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £425.87k | £382.51k | £329.32k | £255.29k | £122.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | £15.02k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 23 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 23 October 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/06/2012
Charitable objects
4. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: A TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF PARENTS TO BE, NEW PARENTS, AND THE PARENTS OF BABIES AND YOUNG CHILDREN, WHO MAY BE EXPERIENCING STRESS OR FACING PROBLEMS WITHIN THE NORMAL RANGE OF PARENTING. B TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, AN UNDERSTANDING OF INFANT MENTAL HEALTH AND EARLY CHILD DEVELOPMENT, WITHIN THE BROAD FRAMEWORK OF OBJECT RELATIONS AND ATTACHMENT THEORIES, AND TO PROVIDE A FOCUS FOR THIS APPROACH IN THE CHARITY'S AREA. C TO PROMOTE, BY TRAINING AND RESEARCH, THE AWARENESS OF THE IMPORTANCE OF EARLY CHILDHOOD DEVELOPMENT AMONG HEALTH PROFESSIONALS AND OTHER PROFESSIONALS INVOLVED WITH EARLY CHILDHOOD, AND ACTIVELY TO DISSEMINATE INFORMATION AND EXAMPLES OF BEST PRACTICE AMONG THESE GROUPS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window