THE HARBURY SENIOR CITIZENS BENEFIT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide the Senior Citizens of Harbury with activities including a Summer Outing, a Christmas Party and entertainment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 25 February 1973: Standard registration
- HARBURY SENIOR CITIZENS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIE CLARKE | Trustee | 17 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN HOLDEN | Trustee | 17 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
LINDA ROE | Trustee | 17 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL MCBRIDE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.81k | £270 | £843 | £1.14k | £1.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.26k | £29 | £886 | £2.03k | £2.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 18 December 2023 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 12 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED ON 2 NOVEMBER 1972
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE PARISH OF HARBURY.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HARBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Park Lane
Harbury
LEAMINGTON SPA
CV33 9HX
- Phone:
- 01926612421
- Email:
- mcbridm@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window