JACK CRAWFORD TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the charrity have concentrated on project development prior to a fund-raising campaigh launch
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 August 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 November 2011: Standard registration
- 13 February 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- JCT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/08/2012 | 01/08/2013 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2013 | 17 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2012 | 30 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/11/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) TO ACQUIRE, RESTORE, PRESERVE AND ASSIST IN THE RESTORATION AND PRESERVATION OF THE RENOWNED CLIPPER SHIP CITY OF ADELAIDE AND TO ENSURE THAT IT IS ACCESSIBLE TO THE PUBLIC. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF SHIPBUILDING, SEAFARING AND INDUSTRIAL HERITAGE OF SUNDERLAND AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window