EAST KENT INDEPENDENT DEMENTIA SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EKIDS provide a range of support groups for those living with dementia and their carers across Thanet and East Kent. The support groups enable carers to gain access to help and advice from the experienced former carers who run all the groups, and from healthcare and other professionals who also attend them, in a friendly, relaxed atmosphere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 13 August 2012: Standard registration
- EKIDS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kelly Collier | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lee Jackson | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Janet Britt | Trustee | 23 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.66k | £3.90k | £9.55k | £9.59k | £9.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.98k | £2.66k | £5.70k | £10.81k | £15.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 03 January 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 16 January 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JUL 2011 AS AMENDED ON 18/07/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE AND GOOD HEALTH OF THOSE LIVING WITH DIMENTIA AND THEIR CARERS IN EAST KENT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT GROUPS AND RELATED ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
EAST KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holy Trinity Church
St. Marys Avenue
MARGATE
Kent
CT9 3TN
- Phone:
- 01843 808321
- Email:
- trustee@ekids.org.uk
- Website:
-
EKIDS.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window