Financial history HELP WIDOW'S & ORPHAN'S

Charity number: 1146723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/12/2019 01/12/2020 01/12/2021 01/12/2022 01/12/2023
Total gross income £5.00k £5.00k £5.00k £5.00k £5.00k
Total expenditure £4.90k £4.90k £4.90k £4.90k £4.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A