Financial history THE GUIRDHAM TRUST FOR INDIA

Charity number: 1143767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £39.03k £20.16k £18.99k £7.54k £20.30k
Total expenditure £29.74k £24.44k £21.48k £13.38k £19.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A