Accounts and annual returns THE HELP FOR POOR PEOPLE LTD

Charity Number: 1145184
Charity reporting is overdue by 1086 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 355 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 355 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 721 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 721 days
Annual return 31 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1086 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1086 days
Annual return 31 July 2020 21 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 02 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required