Financial history THE HELP FOR POOR PEOPLE LTD

Charity number: 1145184
Charity reporting is overdue by 1068 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £4.13k £3.25k £1.90k £2.05k £3.97k
Total expenditure £4.78k £1.58k £4.05k £1.26k £6.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A