Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY AND ALL SAINTS, TRENTHAM
Charity number: 1144889

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ADRIAN GORDON STONE | Chair | 07 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
DAVID CHRISTOPHER BULLOCK | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
JONATHAN MUELLER | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Janice Wendy Hawkins | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Joseph David Roy Palfreyman | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Catherine Elisabeth Allen | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH THOMAS | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Lisa Marie Walters | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Carol Anne Feben | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Christopher George Yates | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Lesley Jean Symon | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Edwards | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
TERENCE JOHN STEELE | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
PAUL ANDREW TOPPING | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
NICHOLAS HOWARD FRANCIS COPESTICK | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
AMANDA McDONALD | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
IRIS BARCROFT | Trustee | 12 April 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.