Financial history THE GREEN DOME ACADEMY

Charity number: 1143909
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £874.71k £961.21k £978.73k £900.89k £916.89k
Total expenditure £631.12k £708.65k £880.78k £940.83k £1.03m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.53k £16.10k £12.87k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £31.95k £102.26k £11.47k £9.84k £41.91k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £842.76k £858.95k £967.26k £891.05k £874.98k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £628.08k £708.65k £880.78k £940.83k £1.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £600 £600 £1.00k £1.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £3.04k £0 £0 £0 £0