CARDIFF REFORM SYNAGOGUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the Charity is the furtherance of the Jewish Faith in accordance with the custom of the Movement for Reform Judaism. This objective is met by organising regular acts of worship, education and other activities based in the Synagogue.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cardiff
Governance
- 02 November 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Solomons | Trustee | 14 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Fuller | Trustee | 14 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Kaye | Trustee | 14 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Stone | Trustee | 11 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nathaniel Lane | Trustee | 11 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof David Cohen | Trustee | 23 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Pitt DCET | Trustee | 12 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
COLIN PETER HEYMAN BSOC MSC | Trustee | 13 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN JOSEPH SALAMON BA HONSACA | Trustee | 02 November 2011 |
|
|||||
Sarah JEAN GOLTEN | Trustee | 02 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
EDDIE CAWSTON | Trustee | 02 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
LIONEL BERNSTEIN | Trustee | 02 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.44k | £65.77k | £85.01k | £69.63k | £71.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.97k | £65.23k | £59.82k | £84.44k | £71.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/03/2010 AS AMENDED ON 22/07/2012 as amended on 10 Jun 2018 as amended on 11 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
A CONGREGATION OF JEWS FORMED FOR THE PURPOSES OF MAINTAINING A PLACE OF PUBLIC WORSHIP IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CUSTOM OF THE MOVEMENT FOR REFORM JUDAISM (MRJ) AND OF ADVANCING AND FURTHERING RELIGIOUS, EDUCATIONAL AND CHARITABLE OBJECTS. THE SYNAGOGUE IS AND SHALL REMAIN A CHARITABLE BODY AND, SUBJECT THERETO, SHALL BE A CONSTITUENT OF THE MRJ WITH POWER TO AFFILIATE TO SUCH OTHER BODIES AS THE COUNCIL OF THE SYNAGOGUE SHALL THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
164 Hansen Court
Heol Glan Rheidol
CARDIFF
CF10 5NY
- Phone:
- 07738819043
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window