THE LANCHESTER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main aim of the charity is to educate the public in the scientific and engineering achievements of the Lanchester brothers particularly in the fields of automotive, aeronautical and production engineering and to encourage engineering and scientific innovation in todays scientists and engineers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 August 2011: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Stuart Pogson | Chair | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Hughes | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian David Clarke | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cathryn Thompson | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100 | £528 | £160 | £0 | £42 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12 | £336 | £2.13k | £2.72k | £300 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 September 2024 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 171 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28/02/2010
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) I).THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SCIENTIFIC, ENGINEERING, AND TECHNOLOGICAL HERITAGE, OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROMOTION OF THE INNOVATIONS, IDEAS AND DEVELOPMENTS OF DR FREDERICK WILLIAM LANCHESTER, GEORGE HERBERT LANCHESTER AND FRANCIS LANCHESTER (THE LANCHESTER BROTHERS) II).THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENTIFIC AND TECHNICAL HERITAGE BY PROMOTION, SPONSORSHIP AND UNDERTAKING OF WORKS AND UNDERTAKINGS TO RESTORE, MAINTAIN, ACQUIRE, CREATE, REPRODUCE OR INFORM ABOUT ITEMS PREVIOUSLY PRODUCED, WRITTEN, INVENTED, DEVELOPED OR MANUFACTURED BY ANY OR ALL OF THE LANCHESTER BROTHERS ACTING INDIVIDUALLY OR TOGETHER WITH ONE ANOTHER, WITH OTHER PARTIES OR BEARING THEIR NAME III).THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENTIFIC, ENGINEERING AND TECHNOLOGICAL EDUCATION BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE GIVING OF GRANTS AND THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND PRIZES TO STUDENTS, OTHER INDIVIDUALS OR NON COMMERCIAL ACADEMIC ORGANIZATIONS STUDYING OR WORKING IN SUCH AREAS OF SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY AND ENGINEERING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 West End
MARCH
Cambridgeshire
PE158DL
- Phone:
- 07880570097
- Email:
- lanchestertrust@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window