TRANS MEDIA WATCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity offers advice and support to trans and intersex people who either find themselves subject to media scrutiny or are thinking of co-operating with the media. The charity also offers training and advice to media professionals and organisations, including broadcasters, journalists, agencies and regulators.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 October 2011: Standard registration
- TMW (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Charlotte Amy Galpin | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
jane fae | Trustee | 17 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Coates | Trustee | 17 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Burton | Trustee | 20 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Mary MacCarthy | Trustee | 25 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.92k | £6.78k | £6.14k | £4.66k | £13.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £805 | £3.68k | £1.07k | £5.66k | £1.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 14 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 07/10/2011
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A) THE ELIMINATION OF TRANSPHOBIA IN THE MEDIA B) INCREASING POSITIVE, WELL-INFORMED REPRESENTATIONS OF TRANSGENDER, INTERSEX AND GENDER VARIANT PEOPLE IN THE MEDIA C) PROMOTING RESPECT AND EQUALITY OF TREATMENT FOR TRANSGENDER, INTERSEX AND GENDER VARIANT PEOPLE PEOPLE, INCLUDING THOSE WORKING IN THE MEDIA D) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN PARTICULAR IN RELATION TO TRANSGENDER, INTERSEX AND GENDER VARIANT ISSUES; E) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON TRANSGENDER, INTERSEX AND GENDER VARIANT ISSUES AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; PROVIDING, ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND EDUCATION TO TRANSGENDER, INTERSEX AND GENDER VARIANT PEOPLE ABOUT HOW TO DEAL WITH THE MEDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX BM TMW
LONDON
WC1N 3XX
- Phone:
- 07789 801816
- Email:
- info@transmediawatch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window