Financial history SHANKLIN THEATRE AND COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity Number: 1146834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £84.90k £84.66k £84.66k £82.59k £211.57k
Total expenditure £64.17k £83.10k £83.10k £38.66k £134.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £9.67k N/A N/A N/A