THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CHRIST IN OXFORD OF THE FOUNDATION OF KING HENRY VIII

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UNIVERSITY COLLEGE AND THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CHRIST IN OXFORD
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£42,621,000
Donations and legacies | £3.38m | |
Charitable activities | £14.79m | |
Other trading activities | £1.86m | |
Investments | £22.40m | |
Other | £193.00k |
Total expenditure:
£43,174,000
Raising funds | £7.49m | |
Charitable activities | £34.42m | |
Other | £1.27m |
-£8,948,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £8.75m | |
Charitable expenditure | £34.42m |
People

402 Employee(s)
60 Trustee(s)
303 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 7 |
£70k to £80k | 12 |
£80k to £90k | 8 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 2 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 14 July 2015: Standard registration
- CHRIST CHURCH, OXFORD (Working name)
- CHRIST CHURCH, OXFORD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
60 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Very Revd Professor Sarah Rosamund Irvine Foot | Chair | 03 November 2011 |
|
|||||||||||
The Revd Canon Professor Luke Bretherton | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Jose Gabriel Rinaldi Simons | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
The Revd Canon Professor Andrew Paul Davison | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Madhusudhan Srinivasan | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Professor Charlotte Ross | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Peter Holder | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Peter John Moger | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Anna Nickerson | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Daniel Jolowicz | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Fabian Pregel | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Professor Stephen Smartt CBE FRS | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Professor Amin Benaissa | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Professor Nicola Smart | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Philippa Roberts | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Associate Professor Andrea Chiavari | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Tamar Koplatadze | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr William Peter Ghosh | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Associate Professor Natoua Romuald Meango | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
The Venerable Jonathan Paul Michael Chaffey | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR LAURENCE BRASSART | Trustee | 29 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Professor Yuji Nakatsukasa | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Associate Professor Ciara Kennefick | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Matthias Holweg | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr YARIN GAL | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Associate Professor ALEXANDER VASUDEVAN | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR ALEXANDER KUO | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr KATHERINE LEBOW | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
PROFESSOR SIMON HISCOCK | Trustee | 06 July 2015 |
|
|||||||||||
CANON PROFESSOR CAROL HARRISON | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|||||||||||
PROFESSOR SIMON JAMES DADSON | Trustee | 03 January 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
LIESL ELDER | Trustee | 29 November 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
PROFESSOR STEFAN NEUBAUER | Trustee | 30 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
PROFESSOR MALCOLM DUNCAN McCULLOCH | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr ANNA JANE CLARK | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR AXEL KUHN | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR JOSEPH SCHEAR | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
PROFESSOR RICHARD WADE-MARTINS | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR LINDSAY JUDSON | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR IAN WATSON | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
PROFESSOR BRIAN WALTER YOUNG | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|||||||||||
PROFESSOR JONATHAN GUY EVRILL CROSS | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|||||||||||
Professor Sarah Mortimer | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|||||||||||
PROFESSOR ROGER LLEWELYN DAVIES | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|||||||||||
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR EDWIN JOHN FLETCHER SIMPSON | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|||||||||||
PROFESSOR JASON J DAVIS | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
PROFESSOR SARAH LOUISE ROWLAND-JONES | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR KEVIN McGERTY | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR MARK JULIAN EDWARDS | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
PROFESSOR GUY RODERICK WILKINSON FRS | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
KARL STEPHEN STERNBERG | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR DOMINIC PAUL MORAN | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
PROFESSOR BRIAN PARKINSON | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
PROFESSOR STEPHANIE J CRAGG MA DPHIL | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR MISHTOONI CARYS ANNE BOSE | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
PROFESSOR JENNIFER YEE | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
PROFESSOR SAM HOWISON | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
PROFESSOR DIRK AARTS | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR GERALDINE A JOHNSON | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR EDWARD GEOFFREY WOLFE KEENE | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.84m | £34.02m | £31.03m | £42.37m | £39.80m | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.98m | £34.46m | £34.64m | £50.73m | £43.17m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £914.00k | £928.48k | £39.93k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.06m | £2.52m | £2.12m | £3.58m | £3.38m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £936.00k | £1.08m | £182.82k | £976.00k | £1.86m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £13.19m | £11.28m | £8.61m | £12.03m | £14.79m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £2.45m | £2.03m | £1.43m | £3.01m | £2.82m | |
|
Income - Investment | £16.99m | £20.08m | £19.60m | £28.18m | £22.40m | |
|
Income - Other | £126.00k | £1.11m | £1.94m | £615.00k | £193.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £24.00k | £109.00k | £60.47k | £6.00k | £355.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £31.01m | £28.73m | £27.92m | £41.13m | £34.42m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £6.33m | £4.86m | £6.11m | £8.65m | £7.49m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £47.00k | £50.00k | £49.21k | £807.00k | £582.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £5.42m | £4.24m | £5.51m | £7.86m | £6.72m | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £652.00k | £865.00k | £609.00k | £947.00k | £1.27m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £17.48m | £17.48m | £15.34m | £14.71m | £13.93m | |
|
Long-term investments | £618.68m | £644.33m | £766.12m | £862.35m | £848.32m | |
|
Other assets | £19.87m | £18.28m | £19.09m | £24.27m | £18.16m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£4.26m | -£3.44m | -£2.99m | -£5.21m | -£3.56m | |
|
Total liabilities | £63.84m | £79.93m | £113.11m | £123.90m | £111.22m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 04 June 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 04 June 2020 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARTERS DATED 20 NOVEMBER 1546 AND 11 DECEMBER 1546 AND STATUTES LAST AMENDED 16 MARCH 2011
Charitable objects
(A)THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION, EDUCATION AND LEARNING, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (I)THE PROVISION, SUPPORT, CONDUCT AND MAINTENANCE OF CHRIST CHURCH CATHEDRAL AS THE CATHEDRAL OF THE DIOCESE OF OXFORD, TOGETHER WITH ITS CHOIR; (II)THE PROVISION, SUPPORT, CONDUCT AND MAINTENANCE OF CHRIST CHURCH AS A COLLEGE WITHIN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD; (III)THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH IN ANY BRANCH OF LEARNING; AND IN SO FAR AS ITS NOT INCOMPATIBLE WITH THE OBJECTS SET OUT IN (A) ABOVE (B)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE, HERITAGE AND SCIENCE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (I)THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF COLLECTIONS OF ARTICLES OF HISTORICAL, AESTHETIC OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST; (II)THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF THE CATHEDRAL AND ITS APPURTENANCES INCLUDING THE CHAPTER HOUSE; AND (III)THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF THE OTHER BUILDINGS OF THE HOUSE AND ITS CURTILAGE INCLUDING THE MEADOW.
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE
Linked charities
- 14 July 2015 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHRIST CHURCH
ST. ALDATES
OXFORD
OX1 1DP
- Phone:
- 01865276177
- Email:
- JAMES.LAWRIE@CHCH.OX.AC.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window