Trustees THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CHRIST IN OXFORD OF THE FOUNDATION OF KING HENRY VIII

Charity number: 1143423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

60 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Very Revd Professor Sarah Rosamund Irvine Foot Chair 03 November 2011
THE ST MARY MAGDALEN OXFORD RESTORATION AND DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
THE FRIDESWIDE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
DIOCESAN TRUSTEES (OXFORD) LTD
The Revd Canon Professor Luke Bretherton Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Dr Jose Gabriel Rinaldi Simons Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
The Revd Canon Professor Andrew Paul Davison Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Dr Madhusudhan Srinivasan Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Professor Charlotte Ross Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Peter Holder Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Rev Peter John Moger Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Anna Nickerson Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Daniel Jolowicz Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Fabian Pregel Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Professor Stephen Smartt CBE FRS Trustee 03 October 2022
None on record
Professor Amin Benaissa Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Professor Nicola Smart Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Philippa Roberts Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Associate Professor Andrea Chiavari Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Dr Tamar Koplatadze Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Dr William Peter Ghosh Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Associate Professor Natoua Romuald Meango Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
The Venerable Jonathan Paul Michael Chaffey Trustee 01 May 2020
DIOCESAN TRUSTEES (OXFORD) LTD
ST EDWARD'S SCHOOL
Received: On time
OXFORD CLERGY CHARITY
Received: On time
BAYNE BENEFACTION
Received: On time
NEW HINKSEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL AND SCHOOL HOUSE OXFORDSHIRE
Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days