Financial history CROSSROADS CHURCH, HUCKNALL

Charity number: 1143371
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2012 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016
Total gross income £47.29k £48.55k £46.07k £39.74k £47.91k
Total expenditure £47.21k £45.01k £44.20k £43.65k £48.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0