Accounts and annual returns PETERBOROUGH AFGHAN SHIA ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1143598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 October 2024 264 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 October 2024 264 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2022 353 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 January 2022 353 days late Download Open in new window