Financial history PETERBOROUGH AFGHAN SHIA ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1143598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £35.66k £52.68k £44.15k £47.43k £46.16k
Total expenditure £30.37k £34.72k £25.86k £36.84k £42.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.37k N/A £11.74k N/A