Accounts and annual returns PACHAWAWAS - CHILDREN OF THE EARTH

Charity Number: 1143738
Charity reporting is overdue by 276 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 16 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 276 days
Accounts and TAR 16 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 276 days
Annual return 16 October 2022 05 August 2024 355 days late
Accounts and TAR 16 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 16 October 2021 12 October 2022 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 16 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 16 October 2020 24 March 2022 220 days late
Accounts and TAR 16 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 16 October 2019 19 May 2021 276 days late
Accounts and TAR 16 October 2019 Not Required