THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, FAREHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Johns PCC has the responsibility of co-operating with the incumbent, the Rev Henry Kendal, in promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social, and ecumenical. It also has maintenance responsibilities for the vicarage, the church hall and 7a Upper St Michaels Grove.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 13 September 2011: Standard registration
- ST JOHN'S PCC, FAREHAM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Mary Frances Dillon-Shallard | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Edward Powell | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeannette Poulter | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT IAN CRANSTONE | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy David Hicks | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
June Carol Haye | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ursulla Odessa Lewis | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Joy Coutts | Trustee | 05 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas McCorkell | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ann Cranstone | Trustee | 13 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Duboc | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Stevenson | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
LIZ WEBB | Trustee | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
GEOFF COLLINS | Trustee | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL ANNE HICKS | Trustee | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
SUE LUPTON | Trustee | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.90k | £89.00k | £108.13k | £129.21k | £119.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.30k | £89.00k | £105.24k | £115.96k | £101.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 November 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 November 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
EXCEPTED PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 25/01/1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Johns Church
Upper St. Michaels Grove
Fareham
PO14 1DN
- Phone:
- 01329280762
- Email:
- office@stjohnsfareham.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window