ROYAL BRITISH LEGION POPPY LOTTERY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Royal British Legion Poppy Lottery Limited is licenced by The Gambling Commission and currently promotes a weekly lottery and the sale of scratchcards through third party retailers. The Royal British Legion Poppy Lottery Limited has been established as a subsidiary charity of The Royal British Legion to raise funds in support of the charitable objects of the Legion (Charity number 219279).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 December 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARY RYAN | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Oppenheimer | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.18m | £3.51m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.18m | £3.51m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £39.72k | £27.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £6.14m | £3.48m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.38m | £2.30m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.80m | £1.20m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £2.38m | £2.30m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 November 2024 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 JAN 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/12/2011
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT AND FACILITATE THE CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES OF THE ROYAL BRITISH LEGION (REGISTERED CHARITY NO. 219279) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAIG HOUSE
199 BOROUGH HIGH STREET
LONDON
SE1 1AA
- Phone:
- 02032072324
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window