Accounts and annual returns KUPURI NATIVE ROOTS FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1144654
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 26 July 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 26 July 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 26 July 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 26 July 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 26 July 2013 17 April 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 July 2013 Not Required
Annual return 26 July 2012 24 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 July 2012 Not Required