BARTON DISTRICT GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATING GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN TO HELP THEM DEVELOP EMOTIONALLY, MENTALLY, PHYSICALLY AND SPIRITUALLY SO THAT THEY CAN MAKE A POSITIVE CONTRIBUTION TO THEIR COMMUNITY AND THE WIDER WORLD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 09 August 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
amber miller | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
mia holder | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
louise holder | Trustee | 03 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr sarah channon | Trustee | 27 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
KERRY CONNOR | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
HELEN GEBLER | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
KERRI KILBY | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
LORENA HOLDER | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH REDDING | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN NIGHTINGALE | Trustee | 02 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.73k | £1 | £1 | £1.58k | £516 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.98k | £128 | £66 | £77 | £4.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 14/12/1922
Charitable objects
EDUCATING GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN TO HELP THEM DEVELOP EMOTIONALLY, MENTALLY, PHYSICALLY AND SPIRITUALLY SO THAT THEY CAN MAKE A POSITIVE CONTRIBUTION TO THEIR COMMUNITY AND THE WIDER WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Grange Road
Barton-le-Clay
Bedford
MK45 4RE
- Phone:
- 07788514613
- Email:
- hgebler@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window