IDIOPATHIC INTRACRANIAL HYPERTENSION UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IIH UK is dedicated to providing sources of information and support to those with Idiopathic Intracranial Hypertension (IIH) and all who support them. We proved small research grants, promote awareness, campaign for funding to facilitate research, and advocate the Charity's public, social and support activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 August 2011: Standard registration
- IIH UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHELLE WILLIAMSON | Chair | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerryann Chalmers-Worth | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Lisa Denton | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Betsy Clarke | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Parr | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.82k | £26.81k | £35.46k | £34.34k | £17.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.84k | £22.99k | £23.30k | £18.54k | £47.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 01 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 19/08/2011 AS AMENDED ON 21/06/2014
Charitable objects
1) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF IDIOPATHIC INTRACRANIAL HYPERTENSION (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "IIH") THROUGH THE PROVISION OF THE BEST POSSIBLE SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL, SUFFERERS AND THE MEDICAL COMMUNITY IN PARTICULAR ON THE SUBJECT OF IIH. 3) TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE CONDITION IIH AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Woburn
Washington
NE38 7JX
- Phone:
- 01914169998
- Email:
- INFO@IIH.ORG.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window