KINGDOM STOREHOUSE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Successfully launched a Trussell Trust Foodbank in Harold Hill Essex. Located in premises rented from Havering it has sufficient capacity to store all food stuffs and provide offices and meeting space to attend to the needs of clients in a sensitive and private manner. The stock of food was adequate for the demand and a team of volunteer helpers were successfully recruited.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Havering
Governance
- 30 August 2011: Standard registration
- 06 November 2013: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 06 November 2013: Funds transferred to 1153554 KINGDOM STOREHOUSE LTD
- HAROLD HILL FOODBANK (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | 19 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | 19 October 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25/07/2011
Charitable objects
A CHARITY WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR DISTRESS FOR PERSONS IN, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAVERING, UNITED KINGDOM, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES BY PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, DEBT ADVICE, HOUSEHOLD FURNITURE AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ITEMS, INTERVIEW AND EMPLOYABILITY MENTORING AND ADVICE AND OTHER CHARITABLE SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window