GUILD CHILDCARE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Childcare provision from 2 year old to school age
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 29 September 2011: Standard registration
- 15 August 2013: Funds received from 1034109 UNITED REFORMED CHURCH PLAYGROUP (FULWOOD)
- 21 February 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- GUILD CHILDCARE (Previous name)
- GUILD CHILDCARE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- GUILD CHILDCARE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20/09/2011
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN PRESTON(HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT'):- (1) TO PROVIDE A HIGH QUALITY OF CARE AND FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND DURING SCHOOL HOLIDAYS AND, IN ADDITION, TO PROVIDE CARE AND EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT TO THOSE CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE; (2) TO ADVANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY ENCOURGAING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE EDUCATIONAL, DEVELOPMENTAL AND OTHER NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window