RICHARD J WILSON SPORTS FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant giving to individuals, usually young persons, and amateur organizations. involved in healthy recreational activities normally in the Ribby with Wrea, and Westby with Plumptons parishes but also within the PR & FY post code areas. Only 75% of previous years income can be allocated to areas outside the two parishes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
Governance
- 14 November 2011: Standard registration
- 20 February 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.36k | £15.34k | £13.19k | £268 | £190 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.32k | £17.53k | £12.43k | £16.90k | £5.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 07 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 AUG 2011
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION AND SPORT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- 1) TO SUPPORT, NORMALLY, YOUNG SPORTSPEOPLE AND SPORTING GROUPS, WITHIN THE POST CODE AREAS OF LANCASHIRE PR AND FY; 2) TO SUPPORT YOUNG PERSONS AND SPORTING GROUPS OUTSIDE POSTCODE AREAS OF PR AND FY IN LANCASHIRE, CHESHIRE, CUMBRIA, MERSEYSIDE, GREATER MANCHESTER, BLACKBURN WITH DARWEN BUT NOT TO EXCEED 25% OF THE INCOME GENERATED IN THE LAST FINANCIAL YEAR; 3) TO PROVIDE SPORTING AND LEISURE FACILTIES IN THE LOCALITY OF RIBBY WITH WREA AND WESTBY WITH PLUMPTON PARISHES; 4) TO HELP IMPROVE EXISTING SPORT AND LEISURE FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCALITIES OF RIBBY WITH WREA AND WESTBY WITH PLUMPTON'S PARISHES AND THE ORGANISATIONS THEREIN.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window