WORCESTER COLLEGE, OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity activities are the advancement of education, religion, learning and research, by the provision of a college in the University of Oxford, for the benefit of the public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£14,719,000
Donations and legacies | £2.73m | |
Charitable activities | £7.13m | |
Other trading activities | £2.84m | |
Investments | £2.03m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£13,850,000
Raising funds | £237.00k | |
Charitable activities | £13.59m | |
Other | £20.00k |
-£2,525,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £257.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £13.59m | |
Retained for future use | £869.00k |
People

317 Employee(s)
47 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 8 |
£70k to £80k | 5 |
£80k to £90k | 5 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 19 August 2011: Standard registration
- 05 June 2018: Funds received from 314078 MARRIOTT TRUST
- PROVOST FELLOWS AND SCHOLARS OF WORCESTER COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
47 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Isaac | Chair | 01 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Weston Booth Struwe | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard D'Arcy | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Viola Kerr | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Parish | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Leila Ullrich | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ronelle Roth | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Boddie | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Walshe | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Huggins | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Emmanuel Breuillard | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Patricia Clavin | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Wouter Mostert | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Tsilly Dagan | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mike Mayo | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Natalia Waights Hickman | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laura Elizabeth Quick | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Leah Caroline Trueblood | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lisa Michelle Wedding | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr HAUKE KNUD MARQUARDT | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr ROBERT SMITH | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETA FOWLER | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDRZEJ STANISLAW MURAWSKI | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALEXANDER STURGIS | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALICE VIOLET | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Bainbridge | Trustee | 31 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Stephen | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr JAMES EDWARDS | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Afifi al-Akiti | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN PARRINGTON | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID STEINSALTZ | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ANDREAS WILLI KAUFMANN | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor GRANT RITCHIE | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr RICHARD EARL | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR LAURA ASHE | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR DONAL NOLAN | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|||||
Dr JOHN SCOTT SCULLION | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR KIM DORA | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr CONRAD LEYSER | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
NIR VULKAN | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr SIMON GEORGE BROOK COWAN | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ENDRE SULI | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ANDREW JONATHAN CARR | Trustee | 18 August 2011 |
|
|||||
Professor KATE TUNSTALL | Trustee | 18 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr GABRIEL STYLIANIDES | Trustee | 18 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ROBERT HARRIS | Trustee | 18 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr BENJAMIN MORGAN | Trustee | 18 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.53m | £10.38m | £12.62m | £18.17m | £14.72m | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.68m | £12.87m | £13.13m | £15.12m | £13.85m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £361.00k | £354.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £10.50m | £3.02m | £5.46m | £9.06m | £2.73m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £497.00k | £371.00k | £13.00k | £1.38m | £2.84m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £7.49m | £5.68m | £5.12m | £5.94m | £7.13m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £8.58m | £775.00k | £449.00k | £7.12m | £46.00k | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.52m | £1.61m | £1.66m | £1.75m | £2.03m | |
|
Income - Other | £103.00k | £475.00k | £364.00k | £46.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £13.91m | £12.26m | £12.56m | £14.39m | £13.59m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £763.00k | £607.00k | £541.00k | £703.00k | £237.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £38.00k | £21.00k | £24.00k | £24.00k | £25.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £49.00k | £43.00k | £34.00k | £63.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £24.00k | £27.00k | £20.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £35.79m | £39.57m | £33.84m | £32.95m | £33.65m | |
|
Long-term investments | £44.53m | £39.59m | £51.57m | £51.25m | £54.24m | |
|
Other assets | £14.73m | £11.08m | £11.90m | £17.78m | £12.36m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£2.35m | -£1.58m | -£1.54m | -£3.48m | -£2.50m | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.94m | £1.45m | £1.42m | £1.42m | £2.34m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 09 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 09 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
FOUNDING DOCUMENT OF 1714 AND STATUTES AMENDED 1995 AND 2011
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, RELIGION, LEARNING AND RESEARCH BY THE PROVISION OF A COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
WORCESTER COLLEGE
WALTON STREET
OXFORD
OX1 2HB
- Phone:
- 01865278300
- Email:
- lodge@worc.ox.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window