SOMALI RELIEF AND DEVELOPMENT FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SRDF supports relief and development projects and advocacy missions as well as provides capacity building through training, pools resources through its members and serves as a forum for debate delivering humanitarian aid and development projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Somalia
Governance
- 02 August 2011: Standard registration
- SOMALIA DROUGHT APPEAL (Working name)
- ZAMZAM FOUNDATION UK (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tahir Mohamed Sheikh Tahir | Chair | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abdullahi Mumin Warsame | Trustee | 03 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abdi Qadir Aadam Shariff | Trustee | 03 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hyder Tahir Mohamed Sheikh Tahir | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £128 | £9.01k | £16.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13 | £13 | £438 | £8.40k | £15.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/09/2011
Charitable objects
2. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 2.1 TO RELIEVE AND ASSIST THE VICTIMS OF WAR, CONFLICT OR NATURAL DISASTER, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FOOD, MEDICAL AID, ACCOMMODATION, ACCESS TO WATER AND SANITATION AND OTHER HUMANITARIAN ASSISTANCE, 2.2 TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: 2.2.1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; 2.2.2 THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; 2.2.3 THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; IN EACH CASE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN SOMALIA AND SURROUNDING COUNTRIES. “SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT” MEANS “DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.”
Area of benefit
SOMALIA AND SURROUNDING COUNTRIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Whitehorse Mews
37 Westminster Bridge Road
London
SE1 7QD
- Phone:
- 02030961787
- Email:
- info@srdf.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window