LONDON CHARITY NEWS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide child education,We are also working for ALZHEIMER Affected People
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
- Australia
- Bangladesh
- Germany
- India
- Pakistan
- United States
Governance
- 09 May 2012: Standard registration
- 26 April 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
- LCN (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.00k | £7.89k | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.90k | £7.75k | £890 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 14 November 2015 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 22/03/2012
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.(B)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ADULTS, YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, TRAINING AND SUPPORT TO ENABLE THEM TO DEVELOP THEIR FULL CAPACITIES AND ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.(C)TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.(D)TO CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window